Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/30/2021 at 16:58:14 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA vs HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hinson, Carl. C. and Hinson, C.. Carl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3245

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hinson, Carl. C.

Hinson, C.. Carl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

Tampa, FL 33615

Defendants

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Tampa, FL 33605

CHAD CHRONISTER, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SHERIFF OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY, FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPAGNOLIA , GREGG

Attorney at RHINO LAWYERS

217 N Howard Ave Ste 102

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/07/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/16/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, RAUL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPAGNOLIA , GREGG