This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/15/2020 at 00:14:11 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, JOSE vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 RODRIGUEZ, JOSE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Holder, P. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5560

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Holder, P. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRO , JOHN S.

Attorney at LIGORI & LIGORI P.A.

1711 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

OLTCHICK , BRIAN ADAM

Attorney at GARRISON, YOUNT, FORTE & MULCAHY, LLC

601 Bayshore Blvd Ste 800

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/21/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF FILING

07/15/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2020345507; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AS TO COUNT I OF PLTFS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS CLAIM FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COUNT II OF PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O THE FLORIDA CHIEF FINACIAL OFFICER AS REGISTERED AGENT 7/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: EXHIBIT 1-3- ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - litserv@callmeonmycell.com ; jcastro@callmeonmycell.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less