This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/08/2023 at 07:40:50 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Jenny vs Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 Rodriguez, Jenny filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam V. and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8917

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Jenny

Defendant

Bank of America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATTI , THOMAS JOHN, III

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/06/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/06/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/07/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

PROOF OF SERVICE

03/15/2023: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE

04/10/2023: NOTICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/10/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COURT TICKET

04/11/2023: COURT TICKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: AT PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023187510; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Bank of America Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Jenny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less