This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/15/2020 at 11:12:02 (UTC).

ROBINSON, CAROL ANN vs ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 ROBINSON, CAROL ANN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Campbell, D. Lisa, Lefler, Lawrence, Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh, Campbell, Lisa D and Tibbals, D.. Wesley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8327

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Campbell, D. Lisa

Lefler, Lawrence

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

Campbell, Lisa D

Tibbals, D.. Wesley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBINSON, CAROL ANN

Brandon, FL 33510

Respondent

ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

Brandon, FL 33510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DENMON , NICOLE MICHELLE

Attorney at DENMON PEARLMAN TRIAL LAWYERS

520 2Nd Ave S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

CAPLANO , KLARIKA JEAN

Attorney at DENMON PEARLMAN

520 2Nd Ave S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

FULMER , ARTHUR CHARLES, Jr

Attorney at FULMER LAW, P.A.

1960 E Edgewood Dr

Lakeland, FL 33803

Respondent Attorney

MATTSON , LUKE ALLEN

Attorney at BRANDON LEGAL GROUP, PLLC

1209 Lakeside Dr

Brandon, FL 33510

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Date Signed: 03/02/2020; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW; Comment: AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Private Attorney: FULMER , ARTHUR CHARLES, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketOUTCOME OF FAMILY MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: COS 06/21/2019; ELIZABETH WELCH; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: KLARIKA J. CAPLANO, ESQ ON BEHALF OF THE PETITIOER; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Petitioner: ROBINSON, CAROL ANN; Respondent: ROBINSON, SHAWN HENRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less