Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/19/2019 at 07:55:27 (UTC).

RIVERO, TAMMY vsLUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 RIVERO, TAMMY vsLUNG INSTITUTE, LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Nielsen, A. Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7765

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Nielsen, A. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENNETT, HOWARD

RIVERO, TAMMY

Hildebran, NC 28637

CINDY GOODENOW AS PR

MAZZA, MARILYN

Bradenton, FL 34203

Defendant

LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

201 E. Kennedy Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VINSON , BEN ANDREW, Jr

Attorney at VINSON LAW PA

505 E Jackson St Ste 305

Tampa, FL 33602

PERRY, GLENN A.

SMITH, JUSTIN A

Attorney at SLOAN, HATCHER, PERRY, RUNGE, ROBERTSON & SMITH LAW

101 E Whaley St

Longview, TX 75601

SLOAN, JOHN D., Jr

BARNES, STEPHEN A, Esquire

Attorney at BARNES TRIAL GROUP

505 South Magnolia Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, NICHOLAS E.

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

TSAO, NAIKANG

GRIFFIN , CHRISTOPHER LEE

3325 Bayshore Blvd Unit F35

Tampa, FL 33629

AMATO , LOUIS X

Attorney at LOUIS X. AMATO, P.A.

28209 Jewel Fish Ln

Bonita Springs, FL 34135

STELLJES, MEGAN R.

 

Court Documents

CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

03/04/2019: CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/15/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/07/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

09/04/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

12/14/2017: CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

08/01/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/31/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

11/22/2016: ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/24/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

12/21/2018: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

01/02/2018: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

10/05/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/03/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

EXHIBIT

03/01/2017: EXHIBIT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/22/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/09/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/17/2016: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/17/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: (FOURTH); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BENNETT, HOWARD; Plaintiff: CINDY GOODENOW AS PR; Plaintiff: MAZZA, MARILYN; Plaintiff: RIVERO, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: OF DEFENDANT LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC S NOTICE AND MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: (FIFTH); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIVERO, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: FOR ITS NOTICE AND MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BENNETT, HOWARD; Plaintiff: RIVERO, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • RESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANT LUNG INSTITUTE LLC S MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BENNETT, HOWARD; Plaintiff: RIVERO, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • OPPOSITION TO; Additional Info: Defendant: LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY; Additional Info: Defendant: LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Additional Info: Defendant: LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: LUNG INSTITUTE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • STIPULATION; Comment: REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO 2ND AMDNED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO; Comment: FILED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIVERO, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIVERO, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 1 ben@vinsonlawoffice.com ; kaiya@vinsonlawoffice.com ; briana@vinsonlawoffice.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Nielsen, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, JUSTIN AARON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Sloan Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VINSON , BEN ANDREW, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNES , STEPHEN ASHLEY