This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/07/2019 at 10:55:31 (UTC).

Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC vs AARC Environmental - Southeast LLC

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against AARC Environmental - Southeast LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3903

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

C/O John L. Dicks Ii, Akerman Llp 401 E. Jackson Street, Suite 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

AARC Environmental - Southeast LLC

400 North Ashley Drive Suite 1775

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICKS, JOHN LARRY, II

Attorney at AKERMAN LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/04/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

03/21/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/18/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/13/2019: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION AND ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

02/13/2019: MOTION AND ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

02/07/2019: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

ORDER OF NOTIFICATION

02/07/2019: ORDER OF NOTIFICATION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/31/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

01/31/2019: MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

02/13/2019: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/16/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • MOTION FOR ORDER; Comment: TRANSFERRING CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: (CORRECTED) ATTCHD SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: OF HEARING July 31, 2019 at 2:00 p.m., is hereby cancelled.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTCHD AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 07/31/2019 2 PM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY THE COURT AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT II AGAINST AARC ENVIRONMENTAL - SOUTHEAST, LLC / EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Comment: EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PLTF TO- john.dicks@akerman.com; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION AND ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Additional Info: Defendant: AARC Environmental - Southeast LLC; Date Signed: 02/13/2019; Judicial Officer: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF NOTIFICATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 02/07/2019; Judicial Officer: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: AARC ENVIRONMENTAL - SOUTHEAST LLC 01/23/2019; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Comment: AGAINST AARC ENVIRONMENTAL - SOUTHEAST, LLC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AARC Environmental - Southeast LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: ***COMMERICAL***; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rivergate Tower Owner, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2019077692; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less