This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/21/2023 at 18:01:00 (UTC).

RIDDELL, STEVEN vs HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 RIDDELL, STEVEN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul, Huey, Paul. L and Huey, Paul L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0295

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

Huey, Paul L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIDDELL, ANA

RIDDELL, STEVEN

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENKINS , JAMES STREETER, III

Defendant Attorney

QUINTERO , CHRISTIE LEE

 

Court Documents

SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

03/13/2023: SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PRIVILEGE LOG

03/08/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/23/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

02/22/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT

12/13/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/13/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/13/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/13/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/13/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DARREN EATON 3/8/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED; Comment: PERSON WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE AT A FIRST CHOICE ROOFING; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED; Comment: PERSON WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE AT ANCHOR PUBLIC ADJUSTING CORP.; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RIDDELL, ANA; Plaintiff: RIDDELL, STEVEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less