Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/19/2021 at 02:22:14 (UTC).

RICHARDSON, VIVIAN SUE - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 RICHARDSON, VIVIAN SUE - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0676

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

SOUSTEK, CAROL A

Holmes Beach, FL 34217

ESTATE OF ROBERT W LINABURY

5401 24Th Terrace N

St. Petersburg, FL 33410

RICHARDSON, JEFFREY

Clearwater, FL 33762

JONES, CYNTHIA

Clearwater, FL 33762

RICHARDSON, LISA

Clearwater, FL 33762

Claimants

MEDICAL CENTER OF TRINITY

C/O Probate Recovery Systems, Llc P.O. Box 40

Largo, FL 33779

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV, LLC

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER, INC

Tampa General Hospital Po Box 1289

Tampa, FL 33601-1289

GULF TO BAY ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES, LLC

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

Decedent

RICHARDSON, VIVIAN SUE

Tampa, FL 33629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

COLON , SONYA CHAYA

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SONYA C. COLON, P.A.

Georgetown Office Park 1311 W Fletcher Ave

Tampa, FL 33612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY; Comment: JEFFREY RICHARDSON - PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTION; Additional Info: Decedent: RICHARDSON, VIVIAN SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: PROOF OF PYM CREDITORS CLAIM - INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV, LLC; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC FORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC FORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketORDER STRIKING CLAIM; Comment: DCM / GULF TO BAY ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSATISFACTION-REL OF CLAIM; Comment: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. PLATINUM; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: OF INTERIM ACCOUNTING; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketINTERIM ACCOUNTING; Additional Info: Decedent: RICHARDSON, VIVIAN SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: OF INTERIM ACCOUNTING; Additional Info: Decedent: RICHARDSON, VIVIAN SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC FORMAL NOTICE; Comment: ESTATE OF ROBERT W LINABURY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: ESTATE OF ROBERT W LINABURY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Personal Representative: SOUSTEK, CAROL A; Petitioner: SOUSTEK, CAROL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: JEFFREY RICHARDSON; Additional Info: Beneficiary: RICHARDSON, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: LISA RICHARDSON; Additional Info: Petitioner: Colon, Sonya

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: CAROL A SOUSTEK; Additional Info: Petitioner: Colon, Sonya

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: CYNTHIA JONES; Additional Info: Petitioner: Colon, Sonya

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Petitioner: Colon, Sonya

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL CENTER OF TRINITY is a litigant

Latest cases where GULF TO BAY ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV LLC is a litigant