Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/31/2021 at 05:31:18 (UTC).

Ricardo, Roggerd vs Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/17/2021 Ricardo, Roggerd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3266

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ricardo, Roggerd

Winter Park, FL 32789

Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant

Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES , CARRINGTON E.

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF CARRINGTON JONES

2307 Lee Rd

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorney

WILKINSON , JAMES CORY

Attorney at GROELLE & SALMON, P.A.

646 94Th Ave N

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/17/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/17/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company; Private Attorney: WILKINSON , JAMES CORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: "AGREED" TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company; Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd; Private Attorney: JONES , CARRINGTON E.; Private Attorney: WILKINSON , JAMES CORY; Date 2: 05/26/2021; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Quiroga, Ronald Alejandro; Plaintiff: Ricardo, Roggerd

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKINSON , JAMES CORY