This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 14:37:17 (UTC).

Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC vs Reuben, Kay B

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Reuben, Kay B. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl and Thomas, Cheryl. K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8825

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

100 W. Cypress Creek Rd. Suite 700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

Reuben, Kay B

Tampa, FL 33603

Time Investment Company Inc

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

United States of America

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Spouse of Kay B Reuben

Tampa, FL 33603

Unknown Tenant 1

Tampa, FL 33603

Unknown Tenant 2

Tampa, FL 33603

United States of America, acting on behalf of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Tenant #1

Tampa, FL 33603

Unknown Tenant #2

Tampa, FL 33603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIN-DUNCAN , KARISSA

Attorney at TRADE CENTRE SOUTH, SUITE 700

100 W Cypress Creek Rd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorneys

FETHERHUFF , BRENDA SUE

Attorney at ATTORNEY PROPERTY CLAIMS

2847 Hollywood Blvd Ste 121

Hollywood, FL 33020

FELDER , ULYSSES L

2847 Hollywood Blvd Ste 121

Hollywood, FL 33020

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/18/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/04/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

04/28/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTIES

04/28/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTIES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/19/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/18/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

CERTIFICATE OF

03/21/2022: CERTIFICATE OF

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

02/17/2022: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/31/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

COMPLAINT

11/04/2021: COMPLAINT

Certification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4)

11/04/2021: Certification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4)

CLERK DETERMINATION PER FRGPJA 2.420(d)(2)(B)

11/04/2021: CLERK DETERMINATION PER FRGPJA 2.420(d)(2)(B)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Reuben, Kay B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Time Investment Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Time Investment Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; JUDGE C.K.THOMAS 04/19/2022; Additional Info: Date 2: 04/19/2022; Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING - 4/19/2022 @930AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: APRIL 19, 2022 at 9:30 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Reuben, Kay B

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINATION PER FRGPJA 2.420(d)(2)(B); Comment: E-FILED Filing # 137946873

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIME INVESTMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chin-Duncan, Karissa, ESQ.