This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/13/2020 at 17:18:03 (UTC).

Residential Homes for Rent, LLC vs Fox, Jonathan

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Residential Homes for Rent, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fox, Jonathan. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hinson, C.. Carl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5570

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hinson, C.. Carl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Residential Homes for Rent, LLC

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Fox, Jonathan

Tampa, FL 33618

Fox Den Properties, LLC

16512 Lake Heather Drive

Tampa, FL 33618

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIM , LORI ALEXANDRA

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

CHAMPAGNE , MARTIN J., Jr

Attorney at CHAMPAGNE LAW FIRM, LLC

1626 N Washington St

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Fox Den Properties, LLC; Defendant: Fox, Jonathan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Fox Den Properties, LLC; Defendant: Fox, Jonathan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Fox Den Properties, LLC; Defendant: Fox, Jonathan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Fox Den Properties, LLC; Defendant: Fox, Jonathan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2 - lheim@bushross.com ; tmcgowen@bushross.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Fox Den Properties, LLC; Defendant: Fox, Jonathan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2 - lheim@bushross.com ; tmcgowen@bushross.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: FOR DAMAGES AND FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Residential Homes for Rent, LLC; Plaintiff: Second Avenue Realty Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less