Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/17/2021 at 00:58:49 (UTC).

Renton, Laura vs Gutshall, Joseph

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Renton, Laura filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Gutshall, Joseph. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DePaul, Wendy. J, DePaul, J. Wendy and DePaul, Wendy J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5246

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DePaul, Wendy. J

DePaul, J. Wendy

DePaul, Wendy J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Renton, Laura

Tampa, FL 33615

Respondent

Gutshall, Joseph

Tampa, FL 33615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON-ESTES , DENA

Attorney at THE WOMENS LAW GROUP, P.L.

2002 N Lois Ave Ste 210

Tampa, FL 33607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE; Comment: WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Respondent: Gutshall, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 403 800 E TWIGGS TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketINITIAL JURISDICTION ORDER; Additional Info: Date 2: 07/07/2021; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: FILE DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Date Signed: 07/07/2021; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 07/07/2021; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: Gutshall, Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES; Additional Info: Date 2: 06/25/2021; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Renton, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON-ESTES , DENA