This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 10/23/2022 at 03:46:44 (UTC).

Reinhart, Thomas vs Koppang, Jon

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Reinhart, Thomas filed an Other lawsuit against Koppang, Jon. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, D. Darren, Stephens, Scott. Steven and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2593

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, D. Darren

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.

6971 Coronet Drive

New Port Richey, FL 34655

Reinhart, Thomas

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants and Decedents

Koppang, Jon

Sarasota, FL 34236

University Medical Park Holding LLC

250 Bird Key Drive

Sarasota, FL 34236

Koppang, Ann Charlotte

Sarasota, FL 34236

University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.

6971 Coronet Drive

New Port Richey, FL 34655

KOPPANG, LOTTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SOLOMON , STANFORD R

Attorney at SOLOMON LAW GROUP, P A

1881 W Kennedy Blvd Ste D

Tampa, FL 33606

HEIM , EMILY MARIE

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON

401 E Jackson St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

FRISCIA , FRANCIS EDWARD

Attorney at FRISCIA & ROSS P A

5550 W Executive Dr Ste 250

Tampa, FL 33609

BOSTIC, TERRANCE A

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN GOGGIN

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/20/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/09/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

01/29/2021: ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/27/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

04/06/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

04/06/2020: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/14/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/17/2020: ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/17/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

LIS PENDENS

09/09/2020: LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/05/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DISCHARGE/RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

10/19/2021: DISCHARGE/RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/09/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/24/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/15/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/12/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/12/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REPLY

02/05/2021: REPLY

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021569528; Judge: Farfante, Darren D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas; Plaintiff: University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas; Plaintiff: University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCHARGE/RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas; Plaintiff: University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2021179148; Judge: Farfante, Darren D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Decedent: Koppang, Ann Charlotte; Defendant: Koppang, Ann Charlotte; Defendant: Koppang, Jon; Defendant: University Medical Park Holding LLC; Defendant: University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.; Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas; Plaintiff: University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.; Private Attorney: FRISCIA , FRANCIS EDWARD; Private Attorney: SOLOMON , STANFORD R;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas; Plaintiff: University Medical Park Owners Association, Inc.; Private Attorney: SOLOMON , STANFORD R;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Additional Info: Decedent: Koppang, Ann Charlotte; Defendant: Koppang, Jon; Defendant: University Medical Park Holding LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4 ssolomon@solomonlaw.com ; mkunkel@solomonlaw.com ; clightbourn@solomonlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Reinhart, Thomas;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less