This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/25/2022 at 18:02:14 (UTC).

Regions Bank vs THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF SHARI D. MOORE A/K/A SHARI MOORE, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Regions Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF SHARI D MOORE A/K/A SHARI MOORE, DECEASED. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, Paul. L and Huey, L. Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4518

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, Paul. L

Huey, L. Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regions Bank

2001 Nw 64Th Street, Suite 130

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

Clerk Of The Court, Hillsborough County, Florida

Tampa, FL 33602

Moore, Chelsea Marie

Denver, CO 80222

Moore, Francis Herbert

Valrico, FL 33594

Mv Realty Pbc, Llc

219 N. Dixie Blvd

Delray Beach, FL 33444

Price, Evan Michael

Plant City, FL 33565

Ryan, Jessica M

Plant City, FL 33565

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF PENNY SUE MOORE F/K/A PENNY SUE WIGGINS, DECEASED

Plant City, FL 33565

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF SHARI D. MOORE A/K/A SHARI MOORE, DECEASED

Plant City, FL 33565

Tobey, Pamela Moore

Dade City, FL 33525

Welch, Kelly Arron

Brandon, FL 33510

Wiggins, Benjamin G

Lake Wales, FL 33898

Guardian Ad Litem

KITE-POWELL , JULIA BLITON

Tampa, FL 33679

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACMILLAN , GAVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at BROCK & SCOTT, PLLC

2001 Nw 64Th St Ste 130

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorneys

FARRIOR , THOMAS RICHARD

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & MCMULLEN

201 N Franklin St Ste 2000

Tampa, FL 33602

GIBSON , JEFFREY W.

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & MCMULLEN

Po Box 1531

Tampa, FL 33601

GOVIN , JAMES W

Attorney at HERMANN & GOVIN

8040 Peters Rd Ste H101

Plantation, FL 33324

GOLDEN , G DONALD

Attorney at THE GOLDEN LAW GROUP

429 Lithia Pinecrest Rd

Brandon, FL 33511

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

06/30/2022: ANSWER

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/29/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE

06/27/2022: RESPONSE

ANSWER

06/15/2022: ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

06/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

06/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

05/31/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Tobey, Pamela Moore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Mv Realty Pbc, Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Defendant: Price, Evan Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Clerk Of The Court, Hillsborough County, Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Clerk Of The Court, Hillsborough County, Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Clerk Of The Court, Hillsborough County, Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED; Comment: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LEINORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF SHARI D. MOORE, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED; Comment: DEFT THE UNKNOWN HEIRS,DEVISEES,GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS,TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF SHARI D. MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Clerk Of The Court, Hillsborough County, Florida; Defendant: Moore, Chelsea Marie; Defendant: Moore, Francis Herbert; Defendant: Mv Realty Pbc, Llc; Defendant: Price, Evan Michael; Defendant: Ryan, Jessica M; Defendant: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF PENNY SUE MOORE F/K/A PENNY SUE WIGGINS, DECEASED; Defendant: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF SHARI D. MOORE A/K/A SHARI MOORE, DECEASED; Defendant: Tobey, Pamela Moore; Defendant: Welch, Kelly Arron; Defendant: Wiggins, Benjamin G; Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Regions Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MV REALTY PBC LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACMILLAN , GAVIN WILLIAM