Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/17/2019 at 14:56:35 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK vs JONES, FRANK

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 REGIONS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONES, FRANK. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1240

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

235 Peachtree St. Ne Suite 1900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendants

JONES, KATHLEEN S

Brandon, FL 33511

JONES, FRANK

Brandon, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKE , PAUL WILLARD

Attorney at DREW ECKL & FARNHAM, LLP

235 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant Attorney

HARVEY , ELYSSA MARIE

Attorney at THE GOLDEN LAW GROUP

808 Oakfield Dr Ste A

Brandon, FL 33511

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/18/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/14/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/28/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/04/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/04/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/04/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/04/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/04/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/04/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/04/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: JONES, KATHLEEN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: JONES, KATHLEEN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: PLT - AGAINST FRANK JONES AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: JONES, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: JONES, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 pwbpleadings@deflaw.com ; kwood@deflaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: JONES, FRANK; Defendant: JONES, KATHLEEN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 pwbpleadings@deflaw.com ; kwood@deflaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Judgment Code: OGSJ; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019190694; Judge: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant