This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/27/2020 at 19:35:47 (UTC).

RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC vs ELEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ELEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1978

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC

1010 N. University Parks Drive

Waco, TX 76707

Defendants

ELEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC

13014 N. Dale Mabry Hwy Suite 213

Tampa, FL 33618

METZLER, PHILIP LEROY

Tampa, FL 33613

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRIGO , CAPRI

Attorney at GORDON & REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

11/22/2019: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

11/22/2019: ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

11/22/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

11/22/2019: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

04/10/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES ON 5/28/2020 @ 9 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: ELEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC; Defendant: METZLER, PHILIP LEROY; Plaintiff: RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC; Private Attorney: TRIGO , CAPRI; Date 2: 05/19/2020; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: METZLER, PHILIP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: METZLER, PHILIP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: METZLER, PHILIP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: ELEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: ELEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC; Defendant: METZLER, PHILIP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Additional Info: Defendant: ELEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Additional Info: Defendant: METZLER, PHILIP LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trigo, Capri