This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/17/2020 at 20:53:08 (UTC).

RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs NASH, PRISCILLA T

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 RAILROAD INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NASH, PRISCILLA T. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3205

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

Defendant

NASH, PRISCILLA T

Tampa, FL 33617

Garnishee

DELTA AIR LINES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOUCH , JEFFREY J, Esquire

Attorney at KASS SHULER PA

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH

Attorney at KASS SHULER, P.A.

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

HEATH , JENNIFER LAYNE

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. SMITH

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2125

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT

04/29/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/20/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/21/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

03/19/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/14/2019: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSRS REOPEN EVENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; Date Signed: 11/08/2019; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DELTA AIR LINES INC., C/O RA, CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, 8/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: 7/24/19 MVV collectionsservice@kasslaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: NASH, PRISCILLA T; Garnishee: DELTA AIR LINES INC; Date Signed: 07/24/2019; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: NASH, PRISCILLA T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: NASH, PRISCILLA T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: PRISCILLA T. NASH, 2/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: NASH, PRISCILLA T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less