This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2023 at 05:53:08 (UTC).

Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc. vs P & H PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against P H PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel, L. Helene, Tesche Arkin, Caroline and Jacobs, Nancy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8657

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Daniel, L. Helene

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

Jacobs, Nancy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.

402 S. Kentucky Ave. Suite 350

Lakeland, FL 33801

Defendants

P & H PROPERTIES, LLC

10 Longfellow Park

Cambridge, MA 02138

YAGER PROPERTIES, LLC

10 Longfellow Park

Cambridge, MA 02138

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEEKS , THEODORE WILLARD, IV

Attorney at TED W. WEEKS IV. P.A.

402 S Kentucky Ave Ste 350

Lakeland, FL 33801

Defendant Attorney

DARBY , AMY MICHELE

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

03/10/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/10/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/10/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/10/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/10/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/10/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER GRANTING

03/10/2023: ORDER GRANTING

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

02/03/2023: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/17/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

12/23/2022: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE

11/16/2022: NOTICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/15/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/17/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 2 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563;; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Nancy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Date Signed: 03/10/2023; Judicial Officer:: Jacobs, Nancy;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: P & H PROPERTIES, LLC; Defendant: YAGER PROPERTIES, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rahenkamp Design Group, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less