This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/16/2019 at 06:01:24 (UTC).

Pupo, Roger M. vs Pupo, Dayli

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Pupo, Roger M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Pupo, Dayli. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0954

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pupo, Roger M.

Tampa, FL 33634

Respondent

Pupo, Dayli

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HODZ , VIVIAN CORTES

Attorney at CORTES HODZ FAMILY LAW & MEDIATION, P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1260

Tampa, FL 33602

Respondent Attorney

SANCHEZ , NILO JOSE, Jr

Attorney at SANCHEZ AND ASSOCIATES PA

1006 N Armenia Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Comment: (WITH MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND PARENTING PLAN ATTACHED); Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.; Respondent: Pupo, Dayli; Signed: 07/05/2019; Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X; Vol./Book: 26784, Page: 1513, Number of Pages: 1513

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED; MSA; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: Pupo, Dayli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketOUTCOME OF FAMILY MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketOUTCOME OF FAMILY MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: VIVIAN CORTES HODZ, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF THE PETITIONER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: Pupo, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 402 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less