Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 08:34:11 (UTC).

PULTE HOME CORPORATION vs SOLANA BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2016 PULTE HOME CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against SOLANA BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Nielsen, A. Richard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6387

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Nielsen, A. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Defendants

SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

OLD DOMINION INSURANCE COMPANY

SPECIALTY TRIM

SOUTHEAST FRAMING, INC.

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SOLANA BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

TOMLINSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CHARLES P. JUSTUS, II INC.

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESTES , THEODORE DAVID

Po Box 3629

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorneys

HORRNIK , ANTHONY M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JASON WEISSMAN

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 501S

Hollywood, FL 33021

BELSKY , ERIC GLENN

Attorney at LEITER BELSKY & THARP

707 Se 3Rd Ave Fl 3

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

KEENER , ROBIN PETRONELLA

201 N Franklin St Ste 3050

Tampa, FL 33602

GIDUS , GREGORY ANDREW

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

OCONNOR , KIERAN F

Attorney at OCONNOR & OCONNOR, LLC

800 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1350

Orlando, FL 32803

SCORDATO , RYAN PAUL

Attorney at LOWNDES, DROSDICK, DOSTER, KANTOR & REED

215 N Eola Dr

Orlando, FL 32801

JONES , GREGORY DAVID

Attorney at RYWANT, ALVAREZ, JONES, RUSSO AND GUYTON

Po Box 3283

Tampa, FL 33601-3283

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/02/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

10/26/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS

CERTIFICATE OF

10/19/2016: CERTIFICATE OF

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

10/18/2016: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

08/30/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/15/2016: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/15/2016: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/02/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/01/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/29/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE

07/27/2016: RESPONSE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

07/22/2016: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CERTIFIED COPY OF

07/07/2016: CERTIFIED COPY OF

CERTIFIED COPY OF

07/07/2016: CERTIFIED COPY OF

COMPLAINT

07/07/2016: COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2017
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Comment: OF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND AMENDED DESIGN OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT; Comment: MATTER SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: LAW OFFICES OF JASON L. WEISSMAN; Additional Info: Defendant: SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION (DEFENDANT SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: SEVER, ABATE AND/OR STAY PLAINTIFF S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: OLD DOMINION INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF; Comment: DEFENDANT'S / MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Comment: **AMENDED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • SEE DOCKET TEXT; Comment: THIS EVENT CREATED TO HOLD ALL OTHER PLEADINGS FROM THE PASCO COUNTY COURT CASE THESE PLEADINGS WERE IN TIF FORMAT. PLEADINGS ARE AVAILABLE ON DISK (FILED IN COURT FILE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • TRANSMITTAL LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • TRANSMITTAL LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: PASCO COUNTY COURT CASE DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • COPY OF; Comment: RECEIPT FOR FILE MAILED BACK TO PASCO COUNTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017077797

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHARLES P JUSTUS II INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TOMLINSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTI is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS I is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD DOMINION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant