Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/17/2021 at 01:37:55 (UTC).

JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR vs Linden, Terri Lynet

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 JESSICA PRYOR, AS P R OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Linden, Terri Lynet. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, L. Emmett and Battles, Emmett. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2836

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, L. Emmett

Battles, Emmett. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pryor, Jessica

West Palm Beach, FL 33437

JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER PRYOR

JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

1919 N. Flagler Dr., #200

West Palm Beach, FL 33437

Defendant

Linden, Terri Lynet

Tampa, FL 33624

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITMAN , BEN J

Attorney at CLARK, FOUNTAIN LA VISTA, PRATHER AND JU

1919 N Flagler Dr Ste 200

West Palm Beach, FL 33407

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES , JEFFREY M.

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

SCHEELE , BRANDON ROBERT

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

KANE , THOMAS E, Jr

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER PA

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/08/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

JOINT STIPULATION

06/09/2021: JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE OF SERVING

04/01/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/11/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/26/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/02/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

04/01/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER; Comment: THE COURT DEEMS THE MATTER APPROPRIATE AND SHALL BE HEARD ON 7-16-21 @ 10:30 VIA WEBEX (Deft's Verified Emergency Motion for Protective Order to Permit Deft's Deposition to Take Place Over Zoom and Memorandum of Law); Additional Info: Defendant: Linden, Terri Lynet; Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER PRYOR; Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR; Private Attorney: JAMES , JEFFREY M.; Private Attorney: WHITMAN , BEN J; Date Signed: 07/16/2021; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL LINDEN TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER DATED JUNE 11, 2021, 8/4/2021 @9:30AM (ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Linden, Terri Lynet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Linden, Terri Lynet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON JOINT STIPULATION ON OUSTANDING DISCOVERY ISSUES; Additional Info: Defendant: Linden, Terri Lynet; Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER PRYOR; Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR; Private Attorney: JAMES , JEFFREY M.; Private Attorney: WHITMAN , BEN J; Date Signed: 06/11/2021; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: UMC HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: (RE) Thursday, July 22, 2021 @ 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Linden, Terri Lynet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TERRI LYNET LINDEN, 4/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x1; Additional Info: Defendant: Linden, Terri Lynet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JESSICA PRYOR, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE PRYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITMAN , BEN J