This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/06/2023 at 09:16:49 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY vs TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2023 PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, Marc. S and Makholm, S. Marc. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9625

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, Marc. S

Makholm, S. Marc

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/08/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/08/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/10/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

03/10/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/21/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/15/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/18/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/02/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2023497582; Judge: Makholm, Marc S

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF POSTAL AND PHYSICAL ADDRESS AND E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY C/O AMANDA GARCIA, REGISTERED AGENT 03/10/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less