This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/20/2021 at 00:22:29 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY vs ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7438

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN, PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/20/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/20/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/22/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, October 7, 2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROULX, JOSEPH C