This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/09/2021 at 22:42:54 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY vs ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, Miriam V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9766

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Chief Financial Officer, Registered Agent 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN, PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/24/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/24/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/25/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/01/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021562956; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: Zurich American Insurance Company c/o Chief Financial Officer, Registered Agent 8/31/2021 CORPORATE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROULX, JOSEPH C