This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/10/2021 at 00:03:03 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY vs SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COM

Case Summary

On 09/06/2021 PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COM. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael, Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3505

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COM

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN, PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

09/09/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROULX, JOSEPH C