This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/15/2021 at 04:11:52 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/06/2021 PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3506

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN, PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/08/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY 9/13/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROULX, JOSEPH C