This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 20:14:52 (UTC).

Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC vs Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8978

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pro-Tech Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Charles Goulden

2451 Mcmullen Booth Rd Suite 301A

Clearwater, FL 33759

Goulden, Charles

Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

2451 Mcmullen Booth Rd Suite 301A

Clearwater, FL 33759

Defendant

Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

C/O Cfo 200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS , LEE HERSON

Attorney at LEE DAVIS LAW, P.A.

2451 N Mcmullen Booth Rd Ste 301A

Clearwater, FL 33759

Defendant Attorney

KUREK , BERNARD JOSEPH, II

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA & ASSOC

506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/14/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/14/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/14/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/14/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/14/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/16/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/16/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pro-Tech Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pro-Tech Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Bernal Aurelio is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS , LEE HERSON