This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/11/2022 at 08:13:38 (UTC).

Pristine Auto Glass, LLC vs Geico Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Pristine Auto Glass, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5124

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAGUERRE, LOUISADIEU

Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Florda Department Of Financial Services Process Section P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

GREENWALT , ANGELA MARIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY (GEICO)

Geico Staff Counsel 4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/21/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/25/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/25/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/04/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/05/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/05/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VERONICA LIGONS is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William