This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/30/2022 at 11:01:37 (UTC).

Pristine Auto Glass Llc vs National General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/18/2022 Pristine Auto Glass Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against National General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7385

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BIGGD - 2255828, LIQUONA

Pristine Auto Glass Llc

6767 N. Wickham Rd. Ste 400

Melbourne, FL 32940

Defendant

National General Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSO , JOHN A

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF JOHN A. RUSSO, P.A.

6767 N Wickham Rd Ste 400

Melbourne, FL 32940

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/18/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/18/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/18/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/18/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/18/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/16/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: National General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VERONICA LIGONS is a litigant

Latest cases where National General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSO JOHN A