This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 05:50:33 (UTC).

Pristine Auto Glass, LLC vs Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Pristine Auto Glass, LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3554

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Joshua Smith

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

SMITH, JOSHUA

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Florida Department Of Financial Services Process Section P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANENBLEY , PETER EDWARD, Jr

Attorney at KANENBLEY CHAPLIN, LLC

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 555S

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorney

SMITH-MARIN , LUCAS RAY

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT J. SMITH

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

06/13/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND TO ANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VERONICA LIGONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kanenbley, Peter Edward Jr