This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 07:51:01 (UTC).

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc vs Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Pristine Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7376

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Jose Perez...

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

PEREZ..., JOSE

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Florida Department Of Financial Services Process Section, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

KANENBLEY , PETER EDWARD, Jr

Attorney at KANENBLEY CHAPLIN, LLC

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 555S

Hollywood, FL 33021

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/08/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022383127; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VERONICA LIGONS is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kanenbley, Peter Edward Jr