This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/23/2023 at 01:36:50 (UTC).

Pristine Auto Glass Llc vs Direct General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Pristine Auto Glass Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Direct General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3344

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glover - 2448679, Christopher

Pristine Auto Glass Llc

Defendant

Direct General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSO , JOHN A

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/29/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/29/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/29/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/09/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/09/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/16/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023195721; Judge: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less