This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 11:56:29 (UTC).

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Pristine Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, Jack. N and Gutman, N. Jack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3731

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Benjamin Williams

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Williams, Benjamin

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Florida Department Of Financial Services Process Section, P O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON , APRIL YOLANDA

Attorney at GEICO STAFF COUNSEL

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

07/15/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

07/15/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/29/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS , APRIL JOHNSON, ESQ. FOR THE DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND REQUESTS FOR DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VERONICA LIGONS is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William