This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 01:26:44 (UTC).

Priority Mobile Glass vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/15/2022 Priority Mobile Glass filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan, Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2789

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Priority Mobile Glass A/A/O Ryan White

Davie, FL 33314

Priority Mobile Glass

Davie, FL 33314

WHITE, RYAN

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

TERRY , LISA-ANN CAMILLE

9100 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1500

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/18/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/18/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION P PER AO S-2022-003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William