This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 21:47:09 (UTC).

Priority Mobile Glass vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/15/2022 Priority Mobile Glass filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2787

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Priority Mobile Glass A/A/O Lorenzo (Your Way Fitness) Ferguson 2

Davie, FL 33314

LORENZO (YOUR WAY FITNESS) FERGUSON 2

Priority Mobile Glass

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

ROSANSKY, STEPHEN MICHAEL

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

04/08/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/11/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/16/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/16/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/16/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DEFT'S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Priority Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William