This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/13/2022 at 06:55:30 (UTC).

PRIMACARE EMC, INC.,Lewis, Priscilla vs STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 PRIMACARE EMC, INC ,Lewis, Priscilla filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7393

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lewis, Priscilla

PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

MOSES , MARSHA MARIA

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/30/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/30/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/07/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

09/07/2022: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/07/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, a foreign co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PRIMACARE EMC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMACARE EMC, INC., as assignee of Eric Dinh is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman