This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/08/2022 at 16:06:22 (UTC).

Premier Trailers, LLC vs Postal Fleet Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Premier Trailers, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Postal Fleet Services, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6874

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Premier Trailers, LLC

5201 Tennyson Parkway, Suite 250

Plano, TX 75024

Defendant

Postal Fleet Services, Inc.

2808 5Th Street N, Suite 501

Saint Augustine, FL 32084

Garnishee

UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAUGHEY, II, R J, Esquire

Attorney at SIVYER BARLOW & WATSON P.A.

401 E Jackson St Ste 2225

Tampa, FL 33602-5213

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/24/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/24/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/24/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE

06/08/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

06/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/21/2022: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF SERVING

04/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

04/19/2022: ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/07/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

04/01/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

12/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

11/29/2021: E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

11/29/2021: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

11/29/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION

10/27/2021: JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

09/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJAG; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE; Instrument Number: 2022301508; Judge: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: JUNE 7, 2022 @ 9:00AM- VIA ZOOM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: FINAL - OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Comment: ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: MAY 12,2022 AT 1:00PM; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/19/2022; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927 Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Garnishee: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Postal Fleet Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Premier Trailers, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premier Trailer Leasing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where POSTAL FLEET SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAUGHEY, II, R J, Esquire