Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2021 at 18:46:33 (UTC).

PRALL, CHRISTINE MARIE - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 PRALL, CHRISTINE MARIE - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0667

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

MARTIN, PAUL

Interlochen, MI 49643

MARTIN, JOHN

Tampa, FL 33612

GATZ, WHITNEY PRALL

Apollo Beach, FL 33572

MARTIN, JAMES

Orlando, FL 32810

Claimants

STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

Tallahassee, FL 32308

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC

O/B/O Citibank, N.A.-Citi Mastercard 200 Coon Rapids Blvd Suite 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433-5876

HEMNESS FALLER ELDER LAW

Brandon, FL 33510

Decedent

PRALL, CHRISTINE MARIE

Apollo Beach, FL 33752

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorneys

FAEHNER , MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at FAEHNER PLLC

600 Bypass Dr Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

KIRKPATRICK , GAYLE WREDE

Attorney at HINES NORMAN HINES, P.L.

315 S Hyde Park Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

HEMNESS , EMMA SLEETH

Attorney at HEMNESS FALLER ELDER LAW

309 N Parsons Ave

Brandon, FL 33510

HITCHCOCK , STEVEN ERNEST

Attorney at HITCHCOCK LAW GROUP

635 Court St Ste 202

Clearwater, FL 33756

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketORD OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Comment: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: GATZ, WHITNEY PRALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: STEVEN E HITCHCOCK, ESQ; Additional Info: Private Attorney: HITCHCOCK , STEVEN ERNEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: GATZ, WHITNEY PRALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: & DESIG EMAIL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MARTIN, PAUL; Personal Representative: MARTIN, PAUL; Petitioner: MARTIN, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $700.00, MJF@FHNR.COM 09/29/20; Additional Info: Claimant: HEMNESS FALLER ELDER LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: O/B/O CITIBANK, N.A. - CITI MASTERCARD $1919.75, MJF@FHNR.COM 09/16/20; Additional Info: Claimant: ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Additional Info: Decedent: PRALL, CHRISTINE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERS REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MARTIN, PAUL; Personal Representative: MARTIN, PAUL; Petitioner: MARTIN, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: MICHAEL J FAEHNER ESQ DATED 3/2/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: JAMES MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: JOHN MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: PAUL MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Petitioner: Faehner, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: OATH OF PAUL MARTIN - FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED TO SUBMIT THE ORIGINAL PAPERWORK TO THE CLERK S OFFICE FOR PROCESSING; Additional Info: Petitioner: Faehner, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: UNSIGNED ORDERS FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Faehner, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: UNSIGNED ORDERS FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Faehner, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL JOHN FAEHNER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRKPATRICK , GAYLE WREDE