This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/23/2021 at 08:28:37 (UTC).

Powell Chiropractic, Inc.,Pearce, Regina vs Progressive Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Powell Chiropractic, Inc ,Pearce, Regina filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0681

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Suite 304

Plantation, FL 33322

Pearce, Regina

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

600 North Westshore Blvd., Suite #500

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorneys

GREENWALT , SEAN PATRICK

Attorney at MARSHAL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN

5802 Breckenridge Pkwy Ste 103

Tampa, FL 33610

VON UNRUH , ERICH

Attorney at ANDREWS BIERNACKI DAVIS

5802 Breckenridge Pkwy Ste 103

Tampa, FL 33610

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/31/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/30/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021397446; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Comment: Erich von Unruh, Esquire; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Powell Chiropractic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VON UNRUH , ERICH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greenwalt, Sean Patrick