This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/25/2021 at 16:24:46 (UTC).

Powell Chiropractic, Inc.,JOHNSON, BRANDON vs Progressive American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Powell Chiropractic, Inc ,JOHNSON, BRANDON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive American Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1496

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Suite 304

Plantation, FL 33322

JOHNSON, BRANDON

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

600 North Westshore Blvd., Suite #500

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

RICCI , LIZA GWENDOLYN

Attorney at PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE

600 N West Shore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/28/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021398412; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Powell Chiropractic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Powell Chiropractic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICCI , LIZA GWENDOLYN