This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 02:34:46 (UTC).

Potvin, Frederick vs General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Potvin, Frederick filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3457

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Potvin, Frederick

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant

General Motors LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CREMEENS , PATRICK J

Attorney at CREMEENS LAW GROUP PLLC

5100 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 270

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorney

KLEIN , STEVEN IRA

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK & CALDWELL PA

Po Box 1873

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/20/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/20/2022: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/26/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: General Motors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, MAY 25, 2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Potvin, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: General Motors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Potvin, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Potvin, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Potvin, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Potvin, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CREMEENS, PATRICK