This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/21/2021 at 01:04:01 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Suarez, Anel

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Suarez, Anel. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, Miriam V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5695

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

Defendant

Suarez, Anel

Tampa, FL 33615-5032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER , SHAYNA L.

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant Attorney

STAVROU , ALEX REED

Attorney at ALEX R. STAVROU, P.A.

13046 Race Track Rd # 333

Tampa, FL 33626

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/07/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/30/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/28/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 08-07-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Suarez, Anel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Suarez, Anel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STAVROU , ALEX REED