This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/27/2021 at 05:03:35 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs Perez, Jovani

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Perez, Jovani. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael, Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5700

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

Defendant

Perez, Jovani

Tampa, FL 33612-5606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER , SHAYNA L.

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/13/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRE-TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Perez, Jovani

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 09/09/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 08/30/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JOVANI PEREZ 07/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Perez, Jovani

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ