This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 01:31:14 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs Medina, Mayra

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Medina, Mayra. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3589

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

Defendant

Medina, Mayra

Sun City Ctr, FL 33573-0258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER , SHAYNA L.

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/23/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

06/01/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: MAYRA MEDINA c/o MAYRA MEDINA 05/26/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Medina, Mayra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ