This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/27/2021 at 01:46:50 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs De La Rosa, Ramon

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against De La Rosa, Ramon. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James S, III, Moody, S. James and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5104

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James S, III

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

Defendant

De La Rosa, Ramon

Tampa, FL 33615-3341

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER , SHAYNA L.

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/22/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/09/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 510 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RAMON DE LA ROSA 07/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: De La Rosa, Ramon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ