This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/19/2022 at 22:20:14 (UTC).

Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC vs Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, Darren. D, Farfante, D. Darren and Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9066

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, Darren. D

Farfante, D. Darren

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Plaza Construction Group

700 N.W. 1St Avenue Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC

700 N.W. 1St Avenue Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33136

Defendants, Counter Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

First American Title Insurance Company

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC

921 Anchorage Road

Tampa, FL 33701

Cross Defendant

TAUB ENTITIES-BAYSHORE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING , BRUCE CHARLES

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

700 N.W. 1 Avenue, Suite 1200 2 S Miami Ave

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RICH, LINDSAY RAE

Attorney at FIRST AMERICAN LAW GROUP

7650 W Courtney Campbell Cswy Ste 1150

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/12/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet

COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO COMPEL

12/28/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL

ANSWER AND COUNTER-PETITION

01/14/2022: ANSWER AND COUNTER-PETITION

E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

01/14/2022: E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/19/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

LETTER TO

01/19/2022: LETTER TO

ANSWER- DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM

01/19/2022: ANSWER- DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER- DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM; Additional Info: Defendant: Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: JEFFREY CLEMENS 07/08/2021; Additional Info: Defendant: Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COUNT IV OF PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Additional Info: Defendant: Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED; Comment: COS 01/14/2022 / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTER-PETITION; Additional Info: Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Additional Info: Defendant: Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company; Defendant: Taub Entities - Bayshore, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies; Comment: CASE REASSIGNED TO DIV L PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce Charles King