This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/02/2023 at 00:03:05 (UTC).

Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc. vs Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6598

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.

Santoyo, Layla

Defendant

Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

TOBIN , LEE ANDREW

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/27/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/27/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/28/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

02/28/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/17/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO STAY

03/28/2023: MOTION TO STAY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/28/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/28/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Platinum Plus Auto Glass, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less