This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/03/2023 at 06:15:35 (UTC).

Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc vs Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Pineapple Auto Glass Calibrations Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7870

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOUNT, RIC

Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc

Defendant

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/27/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/27/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/27/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/30/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/09/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/24/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023128883; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pineapple Auto Glass & Calibrations Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less