This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/10/2020 at 17:31:37 (UTC).

PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC vs TAYLOR MORRISON, INC

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against TAYLOR MORRISON, INC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephens, Scott. Steven and Peacock, A. Emily. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1540

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Peacock, A. Emily

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

201 E. Pine Street

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

COOGAN WINDOW & DOOR, INC.

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

84 LUMBER COMPANY

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

PHOENIX CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES, INC

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

TAYLOR MORRISON OF FLORIDA, INC.

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

TAYLOR MORRISON, INC

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

KEN CREEL STUCCO & STONE, INC.

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

JEFFCO CONSTRUCTION, INC

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

METRO PAINTING TAMPA, INC.

MILLARD ROOFING, INC.

LITTLE M & M S PAINTING, INC.

PROBUILD COMPANY LLC.

JEFFCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TAYLOR MORRISON OF FLORIDA, INC.

Unk

Unk, FL 00000

TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES, INC.

3Rd Party Defendants

GABLE WINDOW REPLACEMENT, INC.

NU SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

ALANIS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

M.A. STUCCO, INC.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DEMERS , GREG K

201 E Pine St Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-2719

CREVASSE , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at BALL JANIK, LLP

201 E Pine St Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

KRASINSKI , BRYAN MARC

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

TRUITT, GEORGE RICHARD, Jr

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

SMITH , MARK AYERS

Attorney at CAREY OMALLEY WHITAKER MUELLER ET AL

712 S Oregon Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

ORTIZ , DORIE LEE

Attorney at CHARTWLL LAW

3275 W Hillsboro Blvd Ste 309

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

LEAVENGOOD , ROBIN H

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

HOUGH , LANNIE DALTON, Jr

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

Carlton Fields Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601

WALLS , JAMES MICHAEL

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, PA

Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601

PORTER , BRIAN C

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601

PIERCE , FRANCIS E, IV

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE

1064 Greenwood Blvd Ste 212

Lake Mary, FL 32746

SWITZER , MICHAEL WILLIAM

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA

222 Lakeview Ave Ste 800

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

ANDERSON , DENISE M.

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMUELLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

KATZ , JEFFREY MARK

Attorney at DALAN, KATZ & SIEGEL, P.L.

2633 Mccormick Dr Ste 101

Clearwater, FL 33759

OCONNOR , KIERAN F

Attorney at OCONNOR & OCONNOR, LLC

800 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1350

Orlando, FL 32803

SARSFIELD , ALEX MICHAEL

Attorney at MILLS PASKERT DIVERS P.A.

100 N Tampa St Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

SCHULMAN , BETH-ANN

Attorney at BOYD & JENERETTE, P.A.

800 N Magnolia Ave Ste 430

Orlando, FL 32803

ZOLLNER , JOSEPH LAURENC

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF AMY L. WARPINSKI

1301 Riverplace Blvd Ste 1640

Jacksonville, FL 32207

PHAGUDA , LEENA

Attorney at MOODY & GRAF, P.A.

1101 North Lake Destiny Rd Ste 200

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEAVENGOOD , ROBIN H

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

PRICE , JAMES LEONARD

Attorney at HAMILTON, PRICE & MARSHALL, P.A.

2400 Manatee Ave W

Bradenton, FL 34205

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/10/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/10/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

11/12/2019: E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/05/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/11/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER

05/15/2019: ORDER

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/14/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/12/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

05/22/2020: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

E-FILED CROSSCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

04/17/2020: E-FILED CROSSCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/18/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/11/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

06/04/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

ORDER DESIGNATING CASE COMPLEX

04/09/2019: ORDER DESIGNATING CASE COMPLEX

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - jkatz@dalan-katz.com ; jromain@dalan-katz.com ; mmahoney@dalan-katz.com; Additional Info: Other: JUANMA LATH STUCCO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Cross-Defendant: KEN CREEL STUCCO & STONE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING KEN CREEL'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT **GRANTED**; Additional Info: Cross-Defendant: KEN CREEL STUCCO & STONE, INC.; Defendant: KEN CREEL STUCCO & STONE, INC.; Third Party Plaintiff: KEN CREEL STUCCO & STONE, INC.; Date Signed: 08/27/2020; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER; Comment: **GRANTING** DEFENDANTS TAYLOR MORRISON OF FLORIDA, INC. AND TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER AND PRODUCE EMAILS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AS STATED AND SET FORTH; Additional Info: Cross-Plaintiff: TAYLOR MORRISON OF FLORIDA, INC.; Defendant: TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES, INC; Date 2: 08/24/2020; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Cross-Defendant: 84 LUMBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: 84 LUMBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NU SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NU SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: TAYLOR MORRISON OF FLORIDA, INC.; Defendant: TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DESIGNATING CASE COMPLEX; Comment: DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK TO REPORT SUCH TO THE SUPREME COURT PURSUANT TO SECTION 25.075, FL STATUES & RULE 2.245(a); Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/08/2019; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: gdemers@balljanik.com ; cbetancourt@balljanik.com ; orlandodocket@balljanik.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PINE RIDGE AT OAK CREEK TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less