This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/05/2023 at 07:17:18 (UTC).

Pierce, Carmen vs The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 Pierce, Carmen filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher, Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, Christopher C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8320

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, Christopher C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pierce, Carmen

Defendant

The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDILLO , PETER M

Defendant Attorney

WILHELM , AMANDA ROUTMAN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/04/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/06/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/08/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

10/04/2022: PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/03/2023: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/04/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/04/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/06/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/08/2023

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF DEMAND FOR PRESERVATION OF ELECTRONIC DATA AND OTHER EVIDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pierce, Carmen;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING // March 16, 2023, at 10:00 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ON; Comment: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE, MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 03/03/2023 / NO EXHIBITS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pierce, Carmen;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO STAY; Comment: DISCOVERY, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less